WV HB5691 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating biennial capitation rate review
Title
Relating to a biennial capitation rate review to be conducted by the Bureau of Medical Services
Sponsors
Del. Michael Hite [R] | Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Heather Tully [R] | Del. Diana Winzenreid [R] |
Del. Evan Worrell [R] | Del. Mark Dean [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 258) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-22 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 258) |
2024-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-16 | House | Originating in House Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16B | 12 | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
9 | 5 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text |