WV HB5635 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-22 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-22 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To allow patients or subscribers of medications to direct pharmacists to list the illness or condition for which a prescription is being issued be listed on the label of the prescription.
Title
Relating to allowing patients to direct prescribers to list the illness or condition for which a prescription is being issued on the label of the prescription
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 257) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-22 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 257) |
2024-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2024-02-20 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-02-20 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-20 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-16 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-02-12 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-12 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60A | 3 | 308 | Amended Code | Citation Text |