WV HB5593 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation, composition, qualifications, and compensation of the State Board of Risk and Insurance Management
Title
Relating to the creation, composition, qualifications, and compensation of the State Board of Risk and Insurance Management
Sponsors
Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] | Del. Clay Riley [R] | Del. Dean Jeffries [R] | Del. Chris Phillips [R] |
Del. Jarred Cannon [R] | Del. David Kelly [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 311) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 311) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 280) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 311) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 280) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 311) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Title amendment adopted |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 311) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 280) |
2024-02-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-22 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-02-22 | House | Committee amendment withdrawn (Voice) |
2024-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2024-02-12 | House | To House Government Organization |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-12 | House | To Government Organization |
2024-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB685 (Similar To) 2024-02-23 - Referred to Rules on 3rd reading
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 12 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |