WV HB5458 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this supplemental appropriation bill is to add new items of appropriation in the aforesaid account for the designated spending unit for expenditure during the fiscal year 2024.
Title
Supplementing and amending appropriations to the Higher Education Policy Commission, administration, control account
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 479) (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 478) (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 478) (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | To Finance |
2024-03-06 | Senate | To Finance |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-05 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 479) |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 478) |
2024-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-03-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | Do pass |
2024-02-05 | House | To House Finance |
2024-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-05 | House | To Finance |
2024-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB655 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - To Finance