WV HB5453 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this supplemental appropriation bill is to add items of appropriation in the aforesaid account for the designated spending unit for expenditure during the fiscal year 2024.
Title
Supplementing and amending appropriations to the Division of Health, Central Office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-03-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | Do pass |
2024-02-05 | House | To House Finance |
2024-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-05 | House | To Finance |
2024-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB665 (Similar To) 2024-04-23 - Chapter 23, Acts, Regular Session, 2024