WV HB5435 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 164, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 164, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish the apprenticeship to associate of applied science degree program to be administered by the Council for Community and Technical College Education.
Title
Establishing the registered apprenticeship to associate of applied science program to be administered by the Council for Community and Technical College Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 708) (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 452) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 333) (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 452) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 333) (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Chapter 164, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 708) |
2024-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 452) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, with title amendment, but first to Finance |
2024-02-28 | Senate | To Education |
2024-02-28 | Senate | To Education then Finance |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 333) |
2024-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-02-08 | House | To House Finance |
2024-02-08 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2024-02-02 | House | To House Education |
2024-02-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-02 | House | To Education then Finance |
2024-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |