WV HB5361 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow influenza immunizations to be offered to patients and residents of specified facilities on a voluntary basis based upon recommendations of the Center for Disease Control.
Title
Relating to allowing influenza immunizations to be offered to hospital patients
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 256) (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-22 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 256) |
2024-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-20 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-16 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-01-30 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2024-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-30 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB492 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - To Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 3 | 4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16B | 3 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |