WV HB5192 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-29 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-29 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Board of Pharmacy to create rules relating to the practice of pharmacy.
Title
Relating to requiring the Board of Pharmacy to promulgate rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 368) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-29 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 368) |
2024-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-26 | House | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-26 | House | Do pass |
2024-01-25 | House | To House Government Organization |
2024-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-25 | House | To Government Organization |
2024-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 5 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |