WV HB5134 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Referred to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Referred to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide for a deceased disabled veteran real property exemption for widowed spouses.
Title
Deceased Disabled Veteran Real Property Exemption for Widowed Spouses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 321) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance |
2024-02-28 | Senate | To Military |
2024-02-28 | Senate | To Military then Finance |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 321) |
2024-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-02-07 | House | To House Finance |
2024-02-07 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2024-01-25 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2024-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-25 | House | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Finance |
2024-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13MM | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 13MM | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |