WV HB5038 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify the authority of state institutions of higher education to enter into agreements and contractual relationships with one or more corporations formed by the state institution of higher education for purposes of fostering research and economic development efforts.
Title
Relating to research and economic development agreements for state institutions of higher education
Sponsors
Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] | Del. Daniel Linville [R] | Del. Patrick Lucas [R] | Del. Sean Hornbuckle [D] |
Del. Clay Riley [R] | Del. Joe Ellington [R] | Del. Evan Worrell [R] | Del. Michael Hornby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2024-02-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-06 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 1/7/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-02 | House | Do pass |
2024-01-23 | House | To House Education |
2024-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-23 | House | To Education |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB543 (Similar To) 2024-04-23 - Chapter 156, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18B | 12 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 12 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 12 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |