WV HB4969 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 338, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 338, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to providing tax credit for the donation or sale of a vehicle to certain charitable organizations
Title
Relating to providing tax credit for the donation or sale of a vehicle to certain charitable organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 385) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 372) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 372) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 338, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-05 | House | To Governor 3/5/20 |
2020-03-05 | House | To Governor 3/5/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-05 | Senate | To Governor 3/5/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-02 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 385) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-29 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2020-02-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 372) |
2020-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-21 | House | Originating in House Finance |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13FF | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13FF | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13FF | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13FF | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13FF | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13FF | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13FF | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |