WV HB4905 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Ban-the-Box Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ban-the-Box Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-07HouseOn 3rd reading, House Calendar
2020-02-27HouseFrom Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
2020-02-26HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-25HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-25HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-24HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-24HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-21HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-02-11HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-02-11HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-11HouseTo Judiciary
2020-02-11HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
296A1New CodeSee Bill Text
296A2New CodeSee Bill Text
296A3New CodeSee Bill Text
296A4New CodeSee Bill Text
296A5New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback