WV HB4882 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing limited sampling and limited sale of wine for off-premises consumption to wineries not licensed in the state

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing limited sampling and limited sale of wine for off-premises consumption to wineries not licensed in the state

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 488) (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 382) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 382) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 328) (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-25HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
2020-03-13HouseTo Governor 3/13/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/13/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/13/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-05SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-02HouseCompleted legislative action
2020-03-04HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-04HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 488)
2020-03-04HouseHouse concurred in Senate effective date (Voice)
2020-03-04HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-02SenateSenate requests House to concur in changed effective date
2020-03-02SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 382)
2020-03-02SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 382)
2020-03-02SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-02SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-02-29SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-29SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-28SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-28SenateImmediate consideration
2020-02-28SenateReported do pass
2020-02-26SenateTo Judiciary
2020-02-26SenateTo Judiciary
2020-02-26SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-25HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-25HousePassed House (Roll No. 328)
2020-02-25HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-25HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-24HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-24HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-21HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-21HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-20HouseDo pass
2020-02-11HouseTo House Government Organization
2020-02-11HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-11HouseTo Government Organization
2020-02-11HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6083Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback