WV HB4842 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to obscene matter to minors
Title
Relating to obscene matter to minors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 613) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 421) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 347) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 421) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 347) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-12 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 613) |
2022-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Title amendment adopted |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Committee title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 421) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2022-03-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-03-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 347) |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-02 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | Do pass |
2022-02-25 | House | Originating in House Judiciary |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 8C | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |