WV HB4779 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 47, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 47, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permit banks the discretion to choose whether to receive deposits from other banks, savings banks, or savings and loan associations when arranging for the re-deposits of county, municipal, and state funds
Title
Permit banks the discretion to choose whether to receive deposits from other banks, savings banks, or savings and loan associations when arranging for the re-deposits of county, municipal, and state funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 581) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 420) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 310) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 420) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 310) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 47, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/25/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-11 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 581) |
2022-03-11 | House | House concurred in Senate title amendment |
2022-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 420) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with title amendment |
2022-03-02 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-03-02 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 310) |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-02-15 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-15 | House | To Judiciary |
2022-02-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 1 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 9 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 6 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 13 | 22a | Amended Code | Citation Text |