WV HB4747 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 171, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 171, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Extending electronic submission of various applications and forms for nonprofit and charitable organizations, professionals and licensees
Title
Extending electronic submission of various applications and forms for nonprofit and charitable organizations, professionals and licensees
Sponsors
Del. Gary Howell [R] | Del. Carl Martin [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 565) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 259) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 259) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 171, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 565) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/6/20 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Returned to calendar by Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Removed from calendar by Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-21 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-21 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 259) |
2020-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-20 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-19 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-18 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-17 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-02-07 | House | To House Government Organization |
2020-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-07 | House | To Government Organization |
2020-02-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 19 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 4A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 2 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |