WV HB4658 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 9, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 9, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Supplementing, amending, decreasing and increasing items of the existing appropriations from the State Road Fund to the Department of Transportation - Division of Highways
Title
Supplementing, amending, decreasing and increasing items of the existing appropriations from the State Road Fund to the Department of Transportation - Division of Highways
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 17) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 17) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 274) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 273) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 17) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 274) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 273) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 9, Acts, 2012 | |
2012-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/16/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/16/12 | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/16/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-10 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-10 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to House | |
2012-03-10 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 17) | |
2012-03-10 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 17) | |
2012-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-10 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-03-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-09 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-03-08 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-08 | Immediate consideration | |
2012-03-08 | On 1st reading | |
2012-03-08 | Reported do pass | |
2012-03-08 | To Finance | |
2012-03-08 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 274) | |
2012-03-08 | Passed House (Roll No. 273) | |
2012-03-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-08 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-07 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-06 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-06 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-03-05 | Do pass | |
2012-03-05 | Originating in House Finance |