WV HB4656 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-12 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-12 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide that the board of Accountancy is an advisory board under the Finance Division within the Department of Administration.
Title
Granting the Finance Division within the Department of Administration supervisory control over the board of Accountancy
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Smith [R] | Del. Scott Cadle [R] | Del. Phyllis White [D] | Sen. Karen Arvon [R] |
Del. Danny Hamrick [R] | Del. Pat McGeehan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-12 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on House Calender |
2016-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-22 | House | Do pass |
2016-02-22 | House | To House Government Organization |
2016-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-22 | House | To Government Organization |
2016-02-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 9 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 9 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 9 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 9 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |