WV HB4621 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 35, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

West Virginia FinTech Regulatory Sandbox Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

West Virginia FinTech Regulatory Sandbox Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 605) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 552) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 437) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 225) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-15HouseChapter 35, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/24/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-24HouseApproved by Governor 3/24/20
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/24/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-19HouseTo Governor 3/19/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateCompleted legislative action
2020-03-07SenateCommunicated to House
2020-03-07SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 605)
2020-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-05HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-05HouseHouse concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 552)
2020-03-05HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-04SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-03-04SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 437)
2020-03-04SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-04SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-03-03SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-03SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-03SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-03-02SenateRead 1st time
2020-03-02SenateImmediate consideration
2020-03-02SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2020-02-19SenateTo Economic Development
2020-02-19SenateTo Economic Development
2020-02-19SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-18HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-18HousePassed House (Roll No. 225)
2020-02-18HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-18HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-17HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-02-17HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-17HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-14HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-14HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-13HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-01-31HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-01-31HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-31HouseTo Judiciary
2020-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31A8G1New CodeSee Bill Text
31A8G2New CodeSee Bill Text
31A8G3New CodeSee Bill Text
31A8G4New CodeSee Bill Text
31A8G5New CodeSee Bill Text
31A8G6New CodeSee Bill Text
31A8G7New CodeSee Bill Text
31A8G8New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4621&year=2020&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4621%20INTR.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=4621
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4621%20SUB.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=4621
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4621%20SUB%20ENG.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=4621
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4621%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=4621
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00225.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/senate/03-04-0437.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00552.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/senate/03-07-0605.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback