WV HB4615 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 92, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

West Virginia Critical Infrastructure Protection Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

West Virginia Critical Infrastructure Protection Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 752) (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 559) (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 176) (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 161) (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 160) (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 159) (Y: 44 N: 54 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-15HouseChapter 92, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-25HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
2020-03-19HouseTo Governor 3/19/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-07HouseCompleted legislative action
2020-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-07HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 752)
2020-03-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-07SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-03-07SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 559)
2020-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-07SenateCommittee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-07SenateWeld Amendments to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-07SenateLindsay Amendments to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-07SenateCommittee Amendment Reported
2020-03-07SenateOn 3rd reading with right to amend, amendment pending
2020-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-06SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-03-05SenateRead 1st time
2020-03-05SenateImmediate consideration
2020-03-05SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2020-02-14SenateTo Judiciary
2020-02-14SenateTo Judiciary
2020-02-14SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-13HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-13HousePassed House (Roll No. 176)
2020-02-13HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-13HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-12HouseAmendment adopted (Roll No. 161)
2020-02-12HouseAmendment adopted (Roll No. 160)
2020-02-12HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 159)
2020-02-12HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-02-12HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-12HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-11HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-11HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-10HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-01-30HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-01-30HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-30HouseTo Judiciary
2020-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
611034New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4615&year=2020&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4615%20INTR.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=4615
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4615%20SUB.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=4615
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4615%20SUB%20ENG.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=4615
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4615%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=4615
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00159.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00160.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00161.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00176.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/senate/03-07-0559.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00752.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback