WV HB4613 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Allowing the Division of Highways use money in the Gas Field Highway Repair and Horizontal Drilling Waste Study Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing the Division of Highways use money in the Gas Field Highway Repair and Horizontal Drilling Waste Study Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, House Calendar
2020-02-24HouseFrom Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar
2020-02-21HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-20HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-20HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-19HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-02-06HouseTo House Finance
2020-02-06HouseDo pass, but first to Finance
2020-01-30HouseTo House Technology and Infrastructure
2020-01-30HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-30HouseTo Technology and Infrastructure then Finance
2020-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221511Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback