WV HB4607 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-29 - To Pensions
Pending: Senate Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-29 - To Pensions
Pending: Senate Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to add additional violations of law, and removes exceptions for certain lesser included crimes, that could cause the forfeiture of a participant’s retirement plan.
Title
Adding violations of law upon which a public servant’s retirement plan may be forfeited
Sponsors
Del. John Shott [R] | Del. Patrick Lane [R] | Del. Michael Folk [R] | Del. Kayla Kessinger [R] |
Del. Eric Householder [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 243) (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | To Pensions |
2016-02-29 | Senate | To Pensions then Judiciary |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-29 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 243) |
2016-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-26 | House | Laid over on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/27 |
2016-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-02-19 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-02-19 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2016-02-18 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2016-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-18 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Judiciary |
2016-02-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 10A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |