WV HB4576 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a procedure for correcting errors in deeds, deeds of trust and mortgages

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a procedure for correcting errors in deeds, deeds of trust and mortgages

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 594) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 612) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 406) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 155) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-25HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
2020-03-19HouseTo Governor 3/19/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-07SenateCompleted legislative action
2020-03-07SenateCommunicated to House
2020-03-07SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 594)
2020-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-05HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-05HouseHouse concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 612)
2020-03-05HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-03SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-03-03SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 406)
2020-03-03SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-03SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-03-02SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-02SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-02SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-29SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-29SenateOn 1st reading
2020-02-28SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2020-02-13SenateTo Judiciary
2020-02-13SenateTo Judiciary
2020-02-13SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-12HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-12HousePassed House (Roll No. 155)
2020-02-12HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-12HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-11HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-11HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-10HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-10HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-07HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-01-28HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-01-28HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-28HouseTo Judiciary
2020-01-28HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
36311New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback