WV HB4568 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Education to provide for the routine education of all professional educators
Title
Requiring the State Board of Education to provide for the routine education of all professional educators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | To House Finance |
2020-02-18 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2020-01-28 | House | To House Education |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-28 | House | To Education then Finance |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4475 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - To House Education
HB4491 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - To House Education
SB230 (Similar To) 2020-04-14 - Chapter 108, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
HB4491 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - To House Education
SB230 (Similar To) 2020-04-14 - Chapter 108, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |