WV HB4519 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 220, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 220, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow certain municipalities participating in the Public Employees Retirement System to choose to have their paid police officers or firefighters move to the Municipal Police Officers and Firefighters Retirement System.
Title
Allowing certain municipalities to elect to participate in the West Virginia Municipal Police Officers and Firefighters Retirement System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 547) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 398) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 216) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 398) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 216) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 220, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/1/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 4/1/2016 - House Journal |
2016-04-01 | House | Approved by Governor 4/1/2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/22/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-22 | House | To Governor 3/22/16 |
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-11 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 547) |
2016-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 398) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-03-03 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Finance |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Finance |
2016-02-27 | Senate | To Pensions |
2016-02-27 | Senate | To Pensions then Finance |
2016-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 216) |
2016-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-02-12 | House | To House Finance |
2016-02-12 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2016-02-11 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-11 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 22A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22A | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22A | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 22A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |