WV HB4465 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-12 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-12 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to eliminate the mathematical definition of salary equity and require the state board, when it determines equity is not being met, to recommend to the Governor and Legislature any legislation or method necessary to achieve it and include sufficient funding in its budget request.
Title
Relating to salary equity among school systems
Sponsors
Del. Walter Duke [R] | Del. Paul Espinosa [R] | Del. Steve Westfall [R] | Del. John Kelly [R] |
Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-12 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on House Calender |
2016-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-22 | House | Do pass |
2016-02-16 | House | To House Finance |
2016-02-16 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2016-02-09 | House | To House Education |
2016-02-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-09 | House | To Education then Finance |
2016-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18A | 4 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |