WV HB4454 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-07 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-07 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit the sale of wine and other legal beverages by private clubs and the sale of wine by private wine bed and breakfasts, private wine restaurants or private wine spa licensees between the hours of ten thirty o’clock a.m. and one o’clock p.m. on Sundays.
Title
Relating to the sale of alcoholic beverages on Sundays by private licensees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 32) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 32) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 31) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 31) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 90) (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 89) (Y: 53 N: 42 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 88) (Y: 41 N: 55 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 32) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 31) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 31) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 90) (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 89) (Y: 53 N: 42 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 88) (Y: 41 N: 55 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 32) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 32) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend, amendment pending |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2014-02-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Judiciary |
2014-02-18 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2014-02-18 | Senate | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-18 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-02-17 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-02-17 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-02-17 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 90) |
2014-02-17 | House | Amendment adopted (Roll No 89) |
2014-02-17 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 88) |
2014-02-17 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2014-02-17 | House | On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, Daily Calender |
2014-02-14 | House | Amendments pending |
2014-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-12 | House | Do pass |
2014-02-10 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-10 | House | To Judiciary |
2014-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 7 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 8 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |