WV HB4433 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 60, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 60, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide high school diplomas to veterans of certain wars regardless of whether they were attending high school before entering the military.
Title
Modifying the criteria for awarding high school diplomas to certain veterans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 325) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 11) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 83) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 11) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 83) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 60, Acts, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor 3/15/12 | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor 3/15/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor 3/15/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-10 | House Message received | |
2012-03-09 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-09 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-09 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 325) | |
2012-03-09 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-08 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2012-03-08 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 11) | |
2012-03-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-08 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-03-07 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-07 | Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent | |
2012-03-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-07 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-03-06 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-06 | Immediate consideration | |
2012-03-06 | On 1st reading | |
2012-03-07 | Reported do pass, with amendment | |
2012-03-01 | To Education | |
2012-03-01 | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Education | |
2012-02-21 | To Military | |
2012-02-21 | To Military then Education | |
2012-02-21 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-20 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-02-20 | Passed House (Roll No. 83) | |
2012-02-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-20 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-17 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-17 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-16 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-16 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-02-15 | By substitute, do pass | |
2012-02-09 | To House Education | |
2012-02-09 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Education | |
2012-02-06 | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security | |
2012-02-06 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-06 | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Education | |
2012-02-06 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |