WV HB4432 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to update the practice of physician assistants and advanced practice register nurses relating to midlevel practitioners. It permits physician assistants to own a practice, and establishes grounds for discipline or denial of a license or other authorization for physician assistants. The bill clarifies physician assistant shareholder eligibility for medical corporations; and deals with the administration of anesthetics; permits physician assistants to serve as designated corporate representatives; and designates the profession of physician assistant as a professional service for the purposes of the Uniform Limited Liability Company Act.
Title
Relating to midlevel practitioners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-23 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 20) (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 19) (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - Committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 17) (Y: 31 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-01-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 19) (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - Committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 17) (Y: 31 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-01-24 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-01-23 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 20) |
2024-01-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 19) |
2024-01-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-22 | House | Committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 17) |
2024-01-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-19 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 1/22/2024 |
2024-01-19 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-18 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-01-18 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-17 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2024-01-10 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-10 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 3 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 3 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
31B | 13 | 1301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |