WV HB4403 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 70, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 70, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changing the filing deadline for certified write-in candidates
Title
Changing the filing deadline for certified write-in candidates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 324) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 10) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 75) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 10) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 75) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 70, Acts, 2012 | |
2012-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/20/10 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor 3/15/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor 3/15/12 | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor 3/15/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-10 | House Message received | |
2012-03-09 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-09 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-09 | Passed House (Roll No. 324) | |
2012-03-09 | House concurred in Senate title amendment | |
2012-03-09 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-08 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2012-03-08 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 10) | |
2012-03-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-08 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-03-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-07 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-03-06 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-06 | On 1st reading | |
2012-03-05 | Reported do pass, with title amendment | |
2012-02-20 | To Judiciary | |
2012-02-20 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-20 | House Message received | |
2012-02-17 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-02-17 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-02-17 | Passed House (Roll No. 75) | |
2012-02-17 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-17 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-16 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-16 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-15 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-15 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Do pass | |
2012-02-02 | To House Judiciary | |
2012-02-02 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-02 | To Judiciary | |
2012-02-02 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB476 (Same As) 2012-02-01 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 6 | 4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |