WV HB4400 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 132, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 132, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to remove language that is no longer relevant to the operation of the company as a private mutual insurance company and amend the current statute where necessary to accommodate policies written to physicians outside the State of West Virginia.
Title
Relating to the West Virginia Physicians Mutual Insurance Company
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 388) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 155) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 155) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 132, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/20/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-20 | House | Approved by Governor 3/20/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/20/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/16/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/16/18 |
2018-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 388) |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-02-20 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-20 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-20 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 155) |
2018-02-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-19 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-16 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-15 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-15 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-14 | House | Postponed on 1st reading, Special Calendar, until 2/15/18 |
2018-02-14 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-13 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-02-09 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-09 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2018-02-01 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2018-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-01 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 20F | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 20F | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 20F | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
33 | 20F | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |