WV HB4388 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Limiting the Alcohol Beverage Control Commissioner's authority to restrict advertising

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limiting the Alcohol Beverage Control Commissioner's authority to restrict advertising

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-20HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-20HouseFrom Housel Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar
2020-02-20HouseOn 1st reading, House Calendar
2020-01-23HouseFrom Special Calendar, 1st reading, placed on House Calendar
2020-01-22HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-21HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-01-16HouseTo House Government Organization
2020-01-16HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-16HouseTo Government Organization
2020-01-16HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
111618Amended CodeCitation Text
11162Amended CodeCitation Text
111622Amended CodeCitation Text
60215Amended CodeCitation Text
60823Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback