WV HB4380 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 105, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 105, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to transportation of athletic teams
Title
Relating to transportation of athletic teams
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 405) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 441) (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 440) (Y: 69 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 439) (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 348) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 94) (Y: 72 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 88) (Y: 23 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 441) (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 440) (Y: 69 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 439) (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 348) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 94) (Y: 72 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 88) (Y: 23 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 105, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-24 | House | To Governor 3/24/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/24/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/24/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 405) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House changed effective date |
2022-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | House requests Senate to concur in changed effective date |
2022-03-09 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 441) |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 440) |
2022-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 439) |
2022-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 348) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments and title amendment |
2022-02-10 | Senate | To Education |
2022-02-10 | Senate | To Education |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 94) |
2022-02-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 88) |
2022-02-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-03 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-25 | House | To House Education |
2022-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-25 | House | To Education |
2022-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 5 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |