WV HB4376 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 5, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 5, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit wine sales at professional baseball stadiums. The bill sets license fees. The bill defines the term professional baseball stadium. The bill provides standards for licensing and authority for the commissioner to regulate such sales. The bill also grants rule-making authority.
Title
Licensing wine sales at certain professional baseball stadiums
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 9) (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 169) (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 168) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 169) (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 168) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 5, Acts, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor 3/15/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor 3/15/12 | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor 3/15/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-09 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-08 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-08 | Communicated to House | |
2012-03-08 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 9) | |
2012-03-08 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) | |
2012-03-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-08 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-03-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-07 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-03-06 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-06 | On 1st reading | |
2012-03-05 | Reported do pass | |
2012-03-01 | To Judiciary | |
2012-03-01 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-29 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-02-29 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 169) | |
2012-02-29 | Passed House (Roll No. 168) | |
2012-02-29 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-29 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-02-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-28 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-27 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-27 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-02-24 | By substitute, do pass | |
2012-02-15 | To House Finance | |
2012-02-15 | Do pass, but first to Finance | |
2012-02-01 | To House Judiciary | |
2012-02-01 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-01 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2012-02-01 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB571 (Same As) 2012-02-10 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 8 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |