WV HB4373 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 60, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 60, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To exclude fentanyl test strips from the definition of drug paraphernalia
Title
To exclude fentanyl test strips from the definition of drug paraphernalia
Sponsors
Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] | Del. Ken Reed [R] | Del. Evan Worrell [R] | Del. Mick Bates [D] |
Del. Heather Tully [R] | Del. Guy Ward [R] | Del. George Miller [R] | Del. Vernon Criss [R] |
Del. John Mandt [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 604) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 449) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 334) (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 449) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 334) (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 60, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-24 | House | To Governor 3/24/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/24/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/24/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 604) |
2022-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 449) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2022-03-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-03-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 334) |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-02 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-02-07 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-02-07 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2022-01-25 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2022-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-25 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2022-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 19 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60A | 4 | 403a | Amended Code | Citation Text |