WV HB4368 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 77, Acts, 2008
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 77, Acts, 2008
Summary
Reducing acts of student violence and disruptive behavior and increasing penalties for chronically disruptive students
Title
Reducing acts of student violence and disruptive behavior and increasing penalties for chronically disruptive students
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Caputo [D] | Del. Joe DeLong [D] | Del. Ronald Fragale [D] | Del. Daniel Poling [D] |
Del. Mary Poling [D] | Del. Kenneth Tucker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-08 | Chapter 77, Acts, 2008 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/17/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-17 | Approved by Governor 3/17/08 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/17/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-11 | To Governor 3/11/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-11 | To Governor 3/11/08 | |
2008-03-12 | To Governor 3/11/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-08 | House Message received | |
2008-03-06 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-06 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 356) | |
2008-03-06 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-05 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2008-03-05 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 37) | |
2008-03-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-05 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 36) | |
2008-03-05 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-03-05 | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-05 | Laid over on 2nd reading 3/4/08 | |
2008-03-05 | Rearranged on Calendar by Rules Committee | |
2008-03-04 | Laid over on 2nd reading 3/3/08 | |
2008-03-03 | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/29/08 | |
2008-02-29 | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/28/08 | |
2008-02-28 | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/27/08 | |
2008-02-27 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-02-26 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-26 | On 1st reading | |
2008-02-26 | Committee reference dispensed | |
2008-02-26 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-02-26 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-25 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-25 | Passed House (Roll No. 123) | |
2008-02-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-25 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-24 | Laid over on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/25/08 | |
2008-02-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-22 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-21 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-21 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-20 | By substitute, do pass | |
2008-01-31 | To House Education | |
2008-01-31 | Introduced in House | |
2008-01-31 | To Education |
Same As/Similar To
SB594 (Similar To) 2008-03-06 - Recommitted to Education on 3rd reading
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4368&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |