WV HB4356 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration of anesthetics
Title
Relating to the administration of anesthetics
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 97) (Y: 70 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 96) (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - Motion to Postpone action on bill and amendment by one day adopted (Roll No. 86) (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 96) (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - Motion to Postpone action on bill and amendment by one day adopted (Roll No. 86) (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-06 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 97) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-05 | House | Amendment adopted (Roll No. 96) |
2020-02-05 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2020-02-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-04 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/5 |
2020-02-04 | House | Amendment pending |
2020-02-04 | House | Motion to Postpone action on bill and amendment by one day adopted (Roll No. 86) |
2020-02-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-03 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-31 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/3/20 |
2020-01-31 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-30 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-01-30 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-29 | House | Do pass |
2020-01-15 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-15 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 7 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |