WV HB4351 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to classify owner operators and independent contractors who contract with licensed and registered trucking companies as nonemployees under worker’s compensation law.
Title
Classifying owner operators and independent contractors who contract with licensed and registered trucking companies as nonemployees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-08 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2018-01-30 | House | To House Industry and Labor |
2018-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-30 | House | To Industry and Labor then Judiciary |
2018-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB454 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - To Government Organization