WV HB4315 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 130, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 130, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to set the maximum amount for air-ambulance services which may be collected pursuant to the plans of the West Virginia Public Employees Insurance Agency.
Title
Relating to air-ambulance fees for emergency treatment or air transportation
Sponsors
Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 483) (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 230) (Y: 61 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 230) (Y: 61 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 130, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-23 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 483) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/11/16 |
2016-03-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 3/9/16 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2016-02-29 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2016-02-29 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Finance |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-29 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-27 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 230) |
2016-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-26 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2016-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on House Calender |
2016-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-23 | House | Laid over on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/24 |
2016-02-23 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-20 | House | With title amendment, do pass |
2016-01-29 | House | To House Finance |
2016-01-29 | House | Do pass with title amendment, but first to Finance |
2016-01-27 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-01-27 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Finance |
2016-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB456 (Similar To) 2016-02-20 - To Finance