WV HB4304 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 191, Acts, 2008
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 191, Acts, 2008
Summary
This bill repeals the current Anatomical Gift Act and replaces it with a Revised Act based on the Uniform Laws Commission's 2006 revision. The Revised Act makes it easier to make a document of gift, particularly with regard to organ donor notations on drivers' licenses and ID cards; authorizes additional persons, such as a medical power of attorney or health care surrogate, to make anatomical gifts on behalf of an incapacitated person before death actually occurs; expands the list of those who may make an anatomical gift after an individual dies without a document of gift; establishes presumptions for distribution for body parts where the anatomical gift that does not specify to whom the gift passes; accommodates the use of donor registries; clearly provides for a document of refusal if an individual does not want organs donated; establishes criminal penalties for misrepresentation of a document of gift for the purposes of selling organs or tissue; and resolves ambiguity and conflict between anatomical gifts and "Do Not Resuscitate" instructions.
Title
Revised Anatomical Gift Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-08 | Chapter 191, Acts, 2008 | |
2008-03-27 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/18/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/18/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-18 | To Governor 3/18/08 | |
2008-03-06 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-06 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-06 | Communicated to House | |
2008-03-06 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 16) | |
2008-03-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-06 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-03-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-05 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-03-04 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-04 | On 1st reading | |
2008-03-03 | Reported do pass | |
2008-02-28 | To Judiciary | |
2008-02-28 | To Judiciary | |
2008-02-28 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-27 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-27 | Passed House (Roll No. 221) | |
2008-02-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-27 | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 220) | |
2008-02-27 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-26 | Laid over on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/27/08 | |
2008-02-26 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-25 | Placed at foot of bills | |
2008-02-25 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-24 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-22 | By substitute, do pass | |
2008-02-14 | To House Judiciary | |
2008-02-14 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2008-01-28 | To House Health and Human Resources | |
2008-01-28 | Introduced in House | |
2008-01-28 | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary | |
2008-01-28 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB341 (Same As) 2008-01-24 - To Health and Human Resources
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4304&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |