WV HB4299 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-22 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-22 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize teachers in elementary or secondary schools to carry concealed firearms and be designated as a school protection officer (SPO).
Title
Permit teachers in K-12 schools be authorized to carry concealed firearms as a designated school protection officer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 251) (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 250) (Y: 13 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 249) (Y: 79 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 250) (Y: 13 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 249) (Y: 79 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-22 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 251) |
2024-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-21 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 250) |
2024-02-21 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-02-21 | House | Amendment adopted (Roll No. 249) |
2024-02-21 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading with amendments pending and right to amend, Special Calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-19 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | Do pass |
2024-01-26 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-01-26 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2024-01-10 | House | To House Education |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-10 | House | To Education then Judiciary |
2024-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 7 | 11a | Amended Code | Citation Text |