WV HB4299 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 62, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 62, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit a county board of education to use bus operators regularly employed by the county board of a different county to operate buses leased by the county, if bus operators from the owning county are unavailable.
Title
Authorizing a county board of education to use the services of a bus operator from another county in certain circumstances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 12) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 13) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 72) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 71) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 13) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 72) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 71) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 62, Acts, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/15/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/15/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-15 | Approved by Governor 3/15/12 | |
2012-03-12 | To Governor 3/12/12 | |
2012-03-12 | To Governor 3/12/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-12 | To Governor 3/12/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-06 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-06 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-06 | Communicated to House | |
2012-03-06 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 12) | |
2012-03-06 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 13) | |
2012-03-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-06 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-03-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-05 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-03-02 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-02 | On 1st reading | |
2012-03-01 | Reported do pass | |
2012-02-20 | To Education | |
2012-02-20 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-20 | House Message received | |
2012-02-17 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-02-17 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 72) | |
2012-02-17 | Passed House (Roll No. 71) | |
2012-02-17 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-17 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-16 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-16 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-15 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-15 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Do pass | |
2012-02-03 | To House Finance | |
2012-02-03 | Do pass, but first to Finance | |
2012-01-25 | To House Education | |
2012-01-25 | Introduced in House | |
2012-01-25 | To Education then Finance | |
2012-01-25 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB415 (Same As) 2012-01-25 - To Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 5 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |