WV HB4298 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-13 - From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-13 - From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to exempt public employees and public employers from the requirements of the insurance provisions of chapter thirty-three of this code.
Title
Exempting certain employers and employees from the requirements of the insurance provisions of chapter thirty-three of this code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-13 | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar | |
2010-02-19 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-19 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-02-18 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2010-02-18 | By substitute, do pass | |
2010-02-02 | To House Banking and Insurance | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced in House | |
2010-02-02 | To Banking and Insurance then Finance | |
2010-02-02 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB450 (Same As) 2010-02-24 - On 2nd reading to Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 16 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4298&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |