WV HB4295 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 92, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 92, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create Innovation in Education designated schools, which demonstrate innovation in STEM, community school partnership, entrepreneurship or career pathways. The bill provides for components and requirements of an Innovation in Education plan. The bill also requires evaluations of Innovation in Education schools and permits amendments to and suspension of Innovation in Education plan components when goals are not met. Additionally, the state board is authorized to terminate Innovation in Education school designations. The bill requires the state board to promulgate a rule relating to implementation and operation of the Innovation in Education program. The bill creates the Innovation in Education Fund. The bill terminates funding for Innovation Zones and Local Solution Dropout Prevention and Recovery Innovation Zones after June 30, 2016.
Title
Relating to the School Innovation Zones Act
Sponsors
Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 617) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 338) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 191) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 338) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 191) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 92, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-23 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 617) |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 338) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-05 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance |
2016-02-26 | Senate | To Education |
2016-02-26 | Senate | To Education then Finance |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 191) |
2016-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-22 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2016-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-01-27 | House | To House Education |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-01-27 | House | To Education then Finance |
2016-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB458 (Similar To) 2016-02-02 - To Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 5B | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5E | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5E | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5E | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5E | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5E | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5E | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5E | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |