WV HB4274 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 149, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 149, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to rename the Department of Health and Human Resources.This bill was recommended for passage during the 2024 legislative session by the Legislative Oversight Commission of Health and Human Resources Accountability.
Title
Renaming the Department of Health and Human Resources
Sponsors
Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Heather Tully [R] | Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] | Del. Bob Fehrenbacher [R] |
Del. Michael Hite [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-22 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 13) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 12) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 39) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 39) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 38) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 3) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 12) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 39) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 39) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 38) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 3) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Chapter 149, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-01-29 | House | Approved by Governor 1/26/24 - House Journal |
2024-01-26 | House | Approved by Governor 1/26/2024 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 1/26/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-01-29 | Senate | To Governor 1/26/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-01-26 | House | To Governor 1/26/2024 |
2024-01-26 | House | To Governor 1/26/2024 - House Journal |
2024-01-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-01-22 | House | Completed legislative action |
2024-01-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-01-22 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 13) |
2024-01-22 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 12) |
2024-01-22 | House | Immediate consideration |
2024-01-22 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 39) |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Title amendment adopted |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 39) |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 38) |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-17 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-01-17 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) |
2024-01-17 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 3) |
2024-01-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-17 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-16 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-01-16 | House | Committee amendment withdrawn (Voice) |
2024-01-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-16 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-15 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-01-15 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-12 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2024-01-10 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-10 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB421 (Similar To) 2024-01-12 - To Health and Human Resources