WV HB4251 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 198, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 198, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to generally amend the Uniform Commercial Code; to improve the system for filing financing statements; provide greater protection for an existing secured party having a security interest in after-acquired property upon relocation of debtor; and to reform the correction statement process. The bill makes technical changes and provides transition rules. §46-9-801, §46-9-802, §46-9-803, §46-9-804, §46-9-805, §46-9-806, §46-9-807, §46-9-808 and §46-9-809 are new; therefore, it has been completely underscored.
Title
Relating generally to amendments to the uniform commercial code
Sponsors
Del. John Doyle [D] | Del. Michael Ferro [D] | Del. John Frazier [D] | Del. Douglas Reynolds [D] |
Del. Ralph Rodighiero [D] | Del. Erikka Storch [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 276) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 6) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 18) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 6) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 18) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 198, Acts, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/15/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/15/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-15 | Approved by Governor 3/15/12 | |
2012-03-14 | To Governor 3/12/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-12 | To Governor 3/12/12 | |
2012-03-14 | To Governor 3/12/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-09 | House Message received | |
2012-03-08 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-08 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-08 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 276) | |
2012-03-08 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-07 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2012-03-07 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 6) | |
2012-03-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-07 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-03-06 | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-06 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-03-05 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-05 | On 1st reading | |
2012-03-02 | Reported do pass | |
2012-03-01 | To Judiciary | |
2012-03-01 | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2012-01-30 | To Interstate Cooperation | |
2012-01-30 | To Interstate Cooperation then Judiciary | |
2012-01-30 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-01-30 | House Message received | |
2012-01-27 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-01-27 | Passed House (Roll No. 18) | |
2012-01-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-01-27 | On 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2012-01-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-01-26 | On 2nd reading, House Calendar | |
2012-01-25 | Read 1st time | |
2012-01-25 | On 1st reading, House Calendar | |
2012-01-24 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2012-01-24 | Do pass | |
2012-01-20 | To House Judiciary | |
2012-01-20 | Introduced in House | |
2012-01-20 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2012-01-20 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB374 (Same As) 2012-01-20 - To Interstate Cooperation
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 11 | 101 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
46 | 11 | 102 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
46 | 11 | 103 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
46 | 11 | 104 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
46 | 11 | 105 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
46 | 11 | 106 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
46 | 11 | 107 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
46 | 11 | 108 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
46 | 2A | 103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46 | 9 | 102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46 | 9 | 105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46 | 9 | 307 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46 | 9 | 311 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46 | 9 | 316 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46 | 9 | 317 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46 | 9 | 326 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46 | 9 | 406 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46 | 9 | 408 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46 | 9 | 502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46 | 9 | 503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46 | 9 | 507 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46 | 9 | 515 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46 | 9 | 516 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46 | 9 | 518 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46 | 9 | 607 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46 | 9 | 625 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46 | 9 | 801 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 9 | 802 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 9 | 803 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 9 | 804 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 9 | 805 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 9 | 806 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 9 | 807 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 9 | 808 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 9 | 809 | New Code | See Bill Text |