WV HB4201 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date

Summary

Creating the Livestock Care Standards Board

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating the Livestock Care Standards Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-11 Effective Date
2010-04-22 Chapter 2, Acts, 2010
2010-03-20 Approved by Governor 4/1/10 - House Journal
2010-04-01 Approved by Governor 4/1/10
2010-03-20 Approved by Governor 4/1/10 - Senate Journal
2010-03-20 To Governor 3/29/10 - Senate Journal
2010-03-29 To Governor 3/29/10
2010-03-20 To Governor 3/29/10 - House Journal
2010-03-13 Completed legislative action
2010-03-13 House Message received
2010-03-13 Communicated to Senate
2010-03-13 House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 400)
2010-03-13 House received Senate message
2010-03-12 Senate requests House to concur
2010-03-12 Passed Senate (Roll No. 32)
2010-03-12 Read 3rd time
2010-03-12 Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 31)
2010-03-12 On 3rd reading
2010-03-12 Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2010-03-12 Read 2nd time
2010-03-12 On 2nd reading
2010-03-11 Read 1st time
2010-03-11 On 1st reading
2010-03-11 Immediate consideration
2010-03-11 Reported do pass, with amendment
2010-03-08 To Government Organization
2010-03-08 Reported do pass, but first to Government Organization
2010-03-04 To Agriculture
2010-03-04 To Agriculture then Government Organization
2010-03-04 Introduced in Senate
2010-03-03 Communicated to Senate
2010-03-03 Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2010-03-03 Passed House (Roll No. 160)
2010-03-03 Read 3rd time
2010-03-03 On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2010-03-02 Read 2nd time
2010-03-02 On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2010-03-01 Read 1st time
2010-03-01 From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar
2010-02-26 By substitute, do pass
2010-02-11 To House Judiciary
2010-02-11 With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
2010-01-27 To House Agriculture
2010-01-27 Introduced in House
2010-01-27 To Agriculture then Judiciary
2010-01-27 Filed for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
191C1Amended CodeCitation Text
191C2Amended CodeCitation Text
191C3Amended CodeCitation Text
191C4Amended CodeCitation Text
191C5Amended CodeCitation Text
191C6Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback