WV HB4199 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Vetoed by Governor 3/28/18 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Vetoed by Governor 3/28/18 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit a nursing home to use trained individuals to administer medication under the direction of a registered professional nurse.
Title
Permitting a nursing home to use trained individuals to administer medication
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 291) (Y: 51 N: 43 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 291) (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 52) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 291) (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 52) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/28/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/28/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-28 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/28/18 |
2018-03-08 | House | To Governor 3/8/18 |
2018-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/8/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-08 | Senate | To Governor 3/8/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-03 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-02 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-02 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 291) |
2018-03-02 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 291) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2018-02-07 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2018-02-07 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 52) |
2018-02-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed at foot of calendar |
2018-02-06 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2018-02-05 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, House Calendar, until 2/6/18 |
2018-02-05 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2018-02-02 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, House Calendar, until 2/5/18 |
2018-02-02 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2018-02-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-01 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-31 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-01-31 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-30 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-24 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-01-24 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2018-01-18 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-18 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2018-01-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 5AA | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5AA | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5AA | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5AA | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5AA | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5AA | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5AA | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5AA | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5AA | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5AA | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 7D | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 13 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |