WV HB4190 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 238, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 238, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish an alert system for missing cognitively impaired persons. The bill provides for the use of video image recording devices for search purposes during a Purple Alert. The bill provides for legislative findings. The bill sets forth criteria for the activation of a Purple Alert. The bill provides for notice and broadcasting of a Purple Alert. Finally, the bill provides immunity for individuals providing information pursuant to a Purple Alert in good faith.
Title
Relating to the establishment of an alert system for missing cognitively impaired persons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - House - Effective July 1, 2024 (Roll No. 627) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 626) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2024 (Roll No. 403) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 403) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - Effective July 1, 2024 (Roll No. 9) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 8) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 626) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2024 (Roll No. 403) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 403) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - Effective July 1, 2024 (Roll No. 9) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 8) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Chapter 238, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-26 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/24 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-08 | House | Effective July 1, 2024 (Roll No. 627) |
2024-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 626) |
2024-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2024 (Roll No. 403) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 403) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2024-01-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-01-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-18 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-01-18 | House | Effective July 1, 2024 (Roll No. 9) |
2024-01-18 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 8) |
2024-01-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-18 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-17 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-01-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-01-15 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-01-10 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-10 | House | To Judiciary |
2024-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 3A | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 3B | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 3B | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 3B | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 3B | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 3F | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3F | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3F | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3F | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3F | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3F | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 3F | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |