WV HB4174 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 250, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 250, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to exempt activity at indoor shooting ranges from the prohibition of shooting or discharging a firearm within five hundred feet of any church or dwelling house; amending the definition of "shooting range" to include an indoor range; to exempt activity at indoor shooting ranges from criminal penalties for shooting or discharging a firearm within five hundred feet of any church or dwelling house; and limiting nuisance actions against shooting ranges.
Title
Exempting activity at indoor shooting ranges from the prohibition of shooting or discharging a firearm within five hundred feet of any church or dwelling house
Sponsors
Del. Brian Kurcaba [R] | Del. Joseph Statler [R] | Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Del. Tom Fast [R] |
Del. John Kelly [R] | Sen. Mike Azinger [R] | Del. Terry Waxman [R] | Del. Saira Blair [R] |
Del. Jill Upson [R] | Del. Cindy Frich [R] | Del. Linda Phillips [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 524) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 622) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 420) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 94) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 622) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 420) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 94) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 250, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/2016 - House Journal |
2016-03-30 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/24/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-24 | House | To Governor 3/24/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/24/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 524) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-12 | House | House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 622) |
2016-03-12 | House | Conference report received-House |
2016-03-12 | House | Conference report filed - House |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Conference report filed - Senate |
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-12 | House | To conference |
2016-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-12 | House | House appointed conferees: Azinger, Foster, Moore |
2016-03-12 | House | House agreed to conference |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Senate appoints conference committee: Ashley, Cline, Beach |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Senate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-12 | House | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 420) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2016-02-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-02-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-19 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-18 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-18 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 94) |
2016-02-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-18 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-17 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-15 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-02-03 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-02-03 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2016-01-20 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-01-20 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary |
2016-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2 | 58 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 6 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |